CO HB1092 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a prohibition on future ownership of an animal for persons convicted of animal cruelty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Ban For Cruelty To Animals Conviction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Governor Signed
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-16SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-15SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-08SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-03-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-31HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1092
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1092_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1092_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1092_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1092_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1092_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1092_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/734ea9bfa207359d872583b60071265c-hb19-1092-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1092vote54ccbb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/734ea9bfa207359d872583b60071265c-hb19-1092-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ab42abe6819794a9872583d60071175b-hb19-1092-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1092vote579d9c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1092vote5e5201
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1092vote5e3f72
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ab42abe6819794a9872583d60071175b-hb19-1092-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback