CO HB1092 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a prohibition on future ownership of an animal for persons convicted of animal cruelty.
Title
Animal Ban For Cruelty To Animals Conviction
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Valdez [D] | Sen. Joann Ginal [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-15 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-31 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |