CO HB1092 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning contracts involving license royalties with proprietors of retail establishments that publicly perform music.
Title
Retail Establishment And Performing Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Lebsock [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-03-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/13/2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2017-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |