CO HB1090 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning certain criminal marijuana offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Marijuana Offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1090 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1090, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20 Governor Signed
2021-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2021-03-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-16HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-03-12HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-03-09HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1090
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1090_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1090_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1090_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1090_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1090_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1090_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1090_L.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1090_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1090_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9fb357b8e9dd271c87258693007121df-hb21-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1090vote54cd92
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/25ce568643d25546872586bf007cb753-hb21-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1090vote62a53e

Bill Comments

feedback