CO HB1090 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the advanced industry investment tax credit, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Industry Investment Tax Credit Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1090 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1090, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1090, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1090, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1090 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1090 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06 Governor Signed
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-10SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-05-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-05-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2017-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-03-01HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2017-02-07HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Finance
2017-01-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Finance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1090
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1090_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1090_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1090_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1090_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1090_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1090_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2017a2017-02-07t133220z-hb17-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-03-01t102613z-hb17-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-02t080552z-hb17-1090-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-02t080552z-hb17-1090-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-02t080552z-hb17-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1252
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-05-05t134230z-hb17-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-05-09t084133z-hb17-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-05-05t134230z-hb17-1090-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback