CO HB1087 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning authorizing education support professionals to participate in the teaching and learning conditions survey, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teaching And Learning Conditions Survey

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1087 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1087 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1087 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-30SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2021-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-03-26HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1087
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1087_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1087_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1087_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1087_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1087_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1087_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1087_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1087_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1087_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1087_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b127be62ad2c74c6872586870070f078-hb21-1087-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2a75ccc4721f95ea872586a4004dae31-hb21-1087-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2a75ccc4721f95ea872586a4004dae31-hb21-1087-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1087vote5ea8a0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/494a716cd7d57bd5872586c5005d60d8-hb21-1087-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/badf6d9cd7aa95fc872586d5004e2ad1-hb21-1087-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1087vote567b5c

Bill Comments 750

feedback