CO HB1085 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the prevention of substance use disorders, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prevention Of Substance Use Disorders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1085 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1085 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.018) (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Move a conceptual amendment to amendment L.009 (Attachment J) to line 3, strike 'fewer' and insert 'lower.' (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment J), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Governor Vetoed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-10SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-06-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1085
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1085_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1085_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1085_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1085_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1085_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1085_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b976426f32d2d18d87258513007638c2-hb20-1085-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b976426f32d2d18d87258513007638c2-hb20-1085-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b976426f32d2d18d87258513007638c2-hb20-1085-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b976426f32d2d18d87258513007638c2-hb20-1085-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b976426f32d2d18d87258513007638c2-hb20-1085-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b976426f32d2d18d87258513007638c2-hb20-1085-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b976426f32d2d18d87258513007638c2-hb20-1085-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b976426f32d2d18d87258513007638c2-hb20-1085-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c52c835823c124bb872585810053814f-hb20-1085-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c52c835823c124bb872585810053814f-hb20-1085-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c52c835823c124bb872585810053814f-hb20-1085-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1085vote56684e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1085vote55f0a1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1085vote56197b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bf72e96495eea13d87258583007ac8e0-hb20-1085-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6704f449d323f28387258583005e479e-hb20-1085-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1085vote6604a9

Bill Comments

feedback