CO HB1085 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the property-related expense assistance grants for low-income seniors and individuals with disabilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Grants For Property Tax Rent And Heat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1085 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1085 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |