CO HB1084 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Home Brewing By Adult For Personal Use

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Brewing By Adult For Personal Use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1084 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1084 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1084 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-18HouseGovernor Signed
2016-03-10HouseSent to the Governor
2016-03-10HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-02-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-22SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-02-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2016-02-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-01HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-01-28HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-01-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3C6EB7BA07E0DAA287257F240063FBFA?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3C6EB7BA07E0DAA287257F240063FBFA/$FILE/1084_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3C6EB7BA07E0DAA287257F240063FBFA/$FILE/1084_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3C6EB7BA07E0DAA287257F240063FBFA/$FILE/1084_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3C6EB7BA07E0DAA287257F240063FBFA/$FILE/1084_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3C6EB7BA07E0DAA287257F240063FBFA/$FILE/1084_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3C6EB7BA07E0DAA287257F240063FBFA/$FILE/1084_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3C6EB7BA07E0DAA287257F240063FBFA/$FILE/1084_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/98B8D0B9498395FD87257F480073987A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/A5CA2CB63405F14E87257F4D005FED75/$FILE/Fb02.pdf#118
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/17D1C5B45610A63C87257F6100778FB4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/E4353B495A1FDA4987257F650052C986/$FILE/jour_045.pdf#298
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/17D1C5B45610A63C87257F6100778FB4

Bill Comments 750

feedback