CO HB1084 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child Care License Status When New FEIN Is Issued

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care License Status When New FEIN Is Issued

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1084, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1084, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1084 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1084 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-15HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-03-11HouseSent to the Governor
2013-03-07HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2013-03-07HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2013-03-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-03-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-04SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-02-27SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-02-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2013-02-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-02-01HouseHouse Second Reading Passed
2013-01-29HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-01-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12B96CC4A59ED57787257AEE0057C0D5?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12B96CC4A59ED57787257AEE0057C0D5/$FILE/1084_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12B96CC4A59ED57787257AEE0057C0D5/$FILE/1084_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12B96CC4A59ED57787257AEE0057C0D5/$FILE/1084_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12B96CC4A59ED57787257AEE0057C0D5/$FILE/1084shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12B96CC4A59ED57787257AEE0057C0D5/$FILE/1084_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12B96CC4A59ED57787257AEE0057C0D5/$FILE/1084_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12B96CC4A59ED57787257AEE0057C0D5/$FILE/1084_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E888992269FBCCDA87257B020073269C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D9F0DDFE0FD7006E87257B1F00613488
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CCB9B17CE3F1A7EA87257B1F00612BE4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E888992269FBCCDA87257B020073269C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D9F0DDFE0FD7006E87257B1F00613488
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CCB9B17CE3F1A7EA87257B1F00612BE4

Bill Comments 750

feedback