CO HB1084 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modify Late Vehicle Registration Fee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify Late Vehicle Registration Fee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1084 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1084 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1084 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1084 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1084 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1084 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-23 Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2011-03-04 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs
2011-02-24 House Third Reading Passed
2011-02-23 House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-02-22 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2011-02-21 House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments
2011-02-18 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-02-03 House Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2011-01-20 Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7766A070129133958725780100605863?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7766A070129133958725780100605863/$FILE/1084_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7766A070129133958725780100605863/$FILE/1084app_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7766A070129133958725780100605863/$FILE/1084_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7766A070129133958725780100605863/$FILE/1084_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/64990DB35547367E8725782C006AF8F1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0409FBA37AF0728D8725783B0051F1C3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B66A8B1199F9865D8725785D0001D1AC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/64990DB35547367E8725782C006AF8F1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0409FBA37AF0728D8725783B0051F1C3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B66A8B1199F9865D8725785D0001D1AC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/64990DB35547367E8725782C006AF8F1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0409FBA37AF0728D8725783B0051F1C3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B66A8B1199F9865D8725785D0001D1AC

Bill Comments 750

feedback