CO HB1083 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a reclassification of the regulation of athletic trainers from registration to licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Athletic Trainers License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1083 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1083 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Governor Signed
2019-03-20 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-07SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2019-02-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-08HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/11/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1083
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1083_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1083_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1083_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1083_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1083_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1083_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1debed239ffbee59872583990070a717-hb19-1083-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1083vote5a66e3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a4d18cfbc1a0a6bf872583b30070e5f5-hb19-1083-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1083vote5a4fae

Bill Comments

feedback