CO HB1082 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of the state historical society to dispose of real property in Georgetown, Colorado.
Title
State Historical Society Authority To Sell Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1082 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-30 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to Finance |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |