CO HB1080 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning benefits for first responders with a disability.
Title
Benefits For First Responders With A Disability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1080 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1080 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1080, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1080, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1080 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1080 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1080, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1080, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2019-02-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-31 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture + Appropriations |