CO HB1079 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pesticide-free Cannabis Certification Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pesticide-free Cannabis Certification Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1079 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1079 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1079 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 30 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 31 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1079 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1079 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1079 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1079, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1079, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1079, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
2016-04-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2016-04-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-22HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-02HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
2016-01-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B12AFB56DDAE0B187257F2400644F05?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B12AFB56DDAE0B187257F2400644F05/$FILE/1079_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B12AFB56DDAE0B187257F2400644F05/$FILE/1079pubhe_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B12AFB56DDAE0B187257F2400644F05/$FILE/1079_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B12AFB56DDAE0B187257F2400644F05/$FILE/1079app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B12AFB56DDAE0B187257F2400644F05/$FILE/1079_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BC02046B3C7BCE1687257F5E0063DDD7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BC02046B3C7BCE1687257F5E0063DDD7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A10D69A824E812A187257F6A0081FF12
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/Clics2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BC02046B3C7BCE1687257F5E0063DDD7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/Clics2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/19A3D90F8DE2791987257F5E00632822
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/Clics2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A10D69A824E812A187257F6A0081FF12
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A10D69A824E812A187257F6A0081FF12
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/19A3D90F8DE2791987257F5E00632822
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E11B2292F14997D087257F9D004FAB39
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B15927EF00E0E40687257F9D004FB085
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B0818754E123E77187257F9D004FB449
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/7B3A37FAE7F9662887257F9D0057A3B1/$FILE/Ap22.pdf#997
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/7B3A37FAE7F9662887257F9D0057A3B1/$FILE/Ap22.pdf#998
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/7B3A37FAE7F9662887257F9D0057A3B1/$FILE/Ap22.pdf#996
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/44F95D6E0A8E53D987257FA00059D3E9/$FILE/Ap25.pdf#1029
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/99A3931598B4D62D87257FA8006DB215
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/99A3931598B4D62D87257FA8006DB215
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3C5EC8BCBE28AFBF87257FA8006D5983

Bill Comments 750

feedback