CO HB1079 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Teen Pregnancy Dropout Prevention Program Funding

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teen Pregnancy Dropout Prevention Program Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1079, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1079 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment j.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1079 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1079 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-10SenateSenate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
2015-02-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2015-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-17HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-02-13HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-01-29HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/73AA91E3493F497387257DA200617193?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/73AA91E3493F497387257DA200617193/$FILE/1079_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/73AA91E3493F497387257DA200617193/$FILE/1079app_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/73AA91E3493F497387257DA200617193/$FILE/1079_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/73AA91E3493F497387257DA200617193/$FILE/1079_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5326E968982F2E8987257DDC00621B0F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5326E968982F2E8987257DDC00621B0F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DD1C3462523F727787257DE400568656
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/07957076F4EDACF987257DE4005675F0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E7A428E6D3A5E8FE87257E040074CA07
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CD524BB50094551587257E0400748777
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9308593E81869E8487257E040074BB1B

Bill Comments 750

feedback