CO HB1079 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creation Of The Joint Technology Committee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creation Of The Joint Technology Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1079 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1079 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1079 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1079 to the Legislative Committee (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1079, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1079, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-18HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-05-17HouseSent to the Governor
2013-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed
2013-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2013-04-15SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Legislative Council
2013-04-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2013-04-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-04-03HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-02HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-02-20HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2013-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5232F7697CF0DA6E87257AEE0057C3F0?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5232F7697CF0DA6E87257AEE0057C3F0/$FILE/1079_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5232F7697CF0DA6E87257AEE0057C3F0/$FILE/1079sa_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5232F7697CF0DA6E87257AEE0057C3F0/$FILE/1079app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5232F7697CF0DA6E87257AEE0057C3F0/$FILE/1079_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5232F7697CF0DA6E87257AEE0057C3F0/$FILE/1079_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5232F7697CF0DA6E87257AEE0057C3F0/$FILE/1079_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5232F7697CF0DA6E87257AEE0057C3F0/$FILE/1079_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5232F7697CF0DA6E87257AEE0057C3F0/$FILE/1079_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/291DAA029B06681387257B1800691DC9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/14D049B1697293EB87257B180068BBC0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/09BDE5B37E9F2B3087257B180068D008
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7F7363DB043179EB87257B4000519729
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7B113C1475DAF69387257B4000519D25
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/19412A5B030C53E187257B4E006F6824
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/22BF5F2E17D0163287257B5900690A4F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D6C44E41A30C556D87257B5C004C72DA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/291DAA029B06681387257B1800691DC9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/14D049B1697293EB87257B180068BBC0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/09BDE5B37E9F2B3087257B180068D008
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7F7363DB043179EB87257B4000519729
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7B113C1475DAF69387257B4000519D25
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/19412A5B030C53E187257B4E006F6824
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/22BF5F2E17D0163287257B5900690A4F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D6C44E41A30C556D87257B5C004C72DA

Bill Comments 750

feedback