CO HB1079 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

CDPS Peace Officer Designations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDPS Peace Officer Designations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1079 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1079 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1079 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1079 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1079 to the Committee on State, Veterans, and Military Affairs (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous vote on House Bill 12-1079 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1079 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous vote on House Bill 12-1079 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1079 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1079 to the Committee on State, Veterans, and Military Affairs (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-16 Governor Action - Signed
2012-03-13 Sent to the Governor
2012-03-06 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-03-05 Senate Second Reading Passed
2012-02-29 Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-02-22 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2012-02-14 House Third Reading Passed
2012-02-13 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
2012-02-08 House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-02-02 House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2012-01-11 Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A268C9CE9754F0C87257981007F3711?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A268C9CE9754F0C87257981007F3711/$FILE/1079_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A268C9CE9754F0C87257981007F3711/$FILE/1079_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A268C9CE9754F0C87257981007F3711/$FILE/1079_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A268C9CE9754F0C87257981007F3711/$FILE/1079_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A268C9CE9754F0C87257981007F3711/$FILE/1079_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A268C9CE9754F0C87257981007F3711/$FILE/1079_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/50A4BF3F020B158287257999000A7AFE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/098DF122C23668CE8725799E007AEB71
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/79CF1BC8BAEC5808872579980083B033
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/513676AFFD72857287257999000A6BDA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/098DF122C23668CE8725799E007AEB71
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/79CF1BC8BAEC5808872579980083B033
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/513676AFFD72857287257999000A6BDA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/50A4BF3F020B158287257999000A7AFE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9561F2C3D042E635872579B3007352C1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9561F2C3D042E635872579B3007352C1

Bill Comments 750

feedback