CO HB1079 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reduce Youth Homelessness

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce Youth Homelessness

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-31 Governor Action - Signed
2011-03-25 Sent to the Governor
2011-03-25 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2011-03-25 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-03-21 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2011-03-17 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2011-03-15 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-03-14 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-08 Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-03-02 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2011-02-22 House Third Reading Passed
2011-02-21 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2011-02-17 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-02-14 House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-01-19 Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2F67EA74C27F06418725780800803AD9?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2F67EA74C27F06418725780800803AD9/$FILE/1079_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2F67EA74C27F06418725780800803AD9/$FILE/1079lg_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2F67EA74C27F06418725780800803AD9/$FILE/1079_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2F67EA74C27F06418725780800803AD9/$FILE/1079_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2F67EA74C27F06418725780800803AD9/$FILE/1079sloc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2F67EA74C27F06418725780800803AD9/$FILE/1079_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2F67EA74C27F06418725780800803AD9/$FILE/1079_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2F67EA74C27F06418725780800803AD9/$FILE/1079_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BA36261EC1300F7287257837007E8996
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/99005F8673C9EC638725784D007BF542
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BA36261EC1300F7287257837007E8996
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/99005F8673C9EC638725784D007BF542

Bill Comments 750

feedback