CO HB1077 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-14)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-14)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement to obtain a patient's informed consent before performing an intimate examination of the patient under specified circumstances, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Informed Consent To Intimate Patient Examinations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-04-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2023 - No Amendments |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-03 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |