CO HB1077 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization for a pharmacist to dispense a chronic maintenance drug to a patient without a current prescription in limited circumstances.
Title
Pharmacist Dispense Drug Without Prescription In Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-03-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-02-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/01/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2019-01-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-01-23 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |