CO HB1077 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the useful public service cash fund.
Title
Useful Public Service Cash Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1077 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1077 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1077 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1077 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-21 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |