CO HB1075 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Registered Naturopathic Doctor Treating Children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registered Naturopathic Doctor Treating Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1075 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment K) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment J) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-26HouseGovernor Signed
2015-03-16HouseSent to the Governor
2015-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-03-13HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-05SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-02-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2015-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-17HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-02-13HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-02-05HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-01-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BDD8B4F74201007E87257DA200619330?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BDD8B4F74201007E87257DA200619330/$FILE/1075_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BDD8B4F74201007E87257DA200619330/$FILE/1075hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BDD8B4F74201007E87257DA200619330/$FILE/1075_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BDD8B4F74201007E87257DA200619330/$FILE/1075_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BDD8B4F74201007E87257DA200619330/$FILE/1075_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BDD8B4F74201007E87257DA200619330/$FILE/1075_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BDD8B4F74201007E87257DA200619330/$FILE/1075_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/72F30807A4F11CA987257DE4000C7238
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E60BAB85AAA4257087257DE40009B325
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9CCCFC80D520031687257DE400098120
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/469E54E0F704297F87257DE4000B89A5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/62F028264243A06E87257DFF007D03B6

Bill Comments

feedback