CO HB1073 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a "support foster families" license plate, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Support Foster Families License Plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1073 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1073 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1073 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1073 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1073 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-08HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1073
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1073_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1073_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1073_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1073_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1073_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1073_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1073_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1073_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1073_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1073_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1073_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/70ba9f334db8ff0b872586a2006d62f9-hb21-1073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d7777674702465ee872586b1005c1a4a-hb21-1073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/70ba9f334db8ff0b872586a2006d62f9-hb21-1073-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/235d8bcf669b2b2a872586c0004e0806-hb21-1073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/235d8bcf669b2b2a872586c0004e0806-hb21-1073-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1073vote5b56a3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/23cfed5b0722c19b872586cc006ec511-hb21-1073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f682c23126324180872586d5004dfe49-hb21-1073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1073vote565ab4

Bill Comments 750

feedback