CO HB1073 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning water districts' ability to enter into contracts regarding their water-related assets.
Title
Water District Ability Contract Water Assets
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gray [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1073 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1073 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1073 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1073 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1073 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1073 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2018-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Finance |