CO HB1072 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning equal access to services related to out-of-home placements.
Title
Equal Access Services For Out-of-home Placements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1072 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment M) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1072 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment M) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |