CO HB1072 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning human trafficking for sexual servitude.
Title
Human Trafficking Sexual Servitude
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |