CO HB1072 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interactive Electronic Harassment
Title
Interactive Electronic Harassment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the rerevised bill as amended, page 2, line 19, after "the", insert "constitutionally protected" (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1072 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1072 to the Committee on Business, Labor, and Technology (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1072 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1072 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1072 to the Committee on Business, Labor, and Technology (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1072 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-04-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-10 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-04-09 | House | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-04-06 | House | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments |
2015-03-27 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Business, Labor, & Technology |
2015-02-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-02-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |