CO HB1072 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income Tax Credit For Child Care Expenses
Title
Income Tax Credit For Child Care Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-06 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-30 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2014-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-02-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2014-02-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |