CO HB1071 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of ranked choice voting in nonpartisan elections.
Title
Ranked Choice Voting In Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.017) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Amendment J.002 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1071 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.017) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Amendment J.002 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1071 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |