CO HB1071 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Register Collector's Motor Vehicles
Title
Register Collector's Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.001, line 12, after "TO REGISTER" insert "OR RE-REGISTER" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.001, line 12, after "TO REGISTER" insert "OR RE-REGISTER" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.001, line 12, after "TO REGISTER" insert "OR RE-REGISTER" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.001, line 12, after "TO REGISTER" insert "OR RE-REGISTER" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-29 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-28 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-25 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-23 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2013-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-07 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-01-30 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2013-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations |