CO HB1070 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of unmanned aircraft systems to perform government functions relating to certain public-safety functions, and, in connection therewith, requiring the center of excellence within the department of public safety to perform a study and operate a pilot program.
Title
Study Drone Use By Public Safety Agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1070 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.009. This motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1070 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1070 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.009. This motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1070 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-05 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-04-28 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2017-04-11 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2017-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |