CO HB1068 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-12)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-12)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning medicaid reimbursement for therapy using equine movement.
Title
Medicaid Reimbursement For Therapy Using Equines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1068 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1068 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1068 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1068, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1068, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1068 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1068 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1068 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1068, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1068, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2022-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |