CO HB1068 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-15)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning health insurance coverage for an annual mental health wellness examination performed by a qualified mental health care provider, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage Mental Health Wellness Exam

Sponsors

Rep. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Jim Smallwood [R]
Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Adrienne Benavidez [D]
Rep. Tracey Bernett [D]Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R]Rep. Andrew Boesenecker [D]
Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D]Rep. Terri Carver [R]Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]Rep. Monica Duran [D]
Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]Rep. Thomas Exum [D]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]Rep. Alec Garnett [D]
Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Matt Gray [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]Rep. Edith Hooton [D]
Rep. Dominique Jackson [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]
Rep. Susan Lontine [D]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]
Rep. Kyle Mullica [D]Rep. David Ortiz [D]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]
Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]Rep. Tom Sullivan [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]
Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]Rep. Mary Young [D]Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]
Sen. John Cooke [R]Sen. Donald Coram [R]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]Sen. Kerry Donovan [D]
Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]Sen. Bob Gardner [R]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]
Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Chris Hansen [D]Sen. Dennis Hisey [R]Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]
Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]Sen. Chris Kolker [D]Sen. Pete Lee [D]Sen. Larry Liston [R]
Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D]Sen. Kevin Priola [R]Sen. Robert Rankin [R]Sen. Ray Scott [R]
Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Jerry Sonnenberg [R]Sen. Tammy Story [D]Sen. Faith Winter [D]
Sen. Rob Woodward [R]Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1068 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1068 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1068, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1068, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1068, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1068, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-19SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2021-05-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-17HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-14HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-05HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1068
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1068_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1068_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1068_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1068_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1068_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1068_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1068_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1068_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1068_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1068_L.004.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1068_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1068_hs2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1068_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1068_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dd47821745a6dddf872586cc006c7cca-hb21-1068-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dd47821745a6dddf872586cc006c7cca-hb21-1068-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dd47821745a6dddf872586cc006c7cca-hb21-1068-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c9a02519104f7910872586d5004de8ae-hb21-1068-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c9a02519104f7910872586d5004de8ae-hb21-1068-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1068vote54a33a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/df9bb22860c5c0cf872586db0001ba31-hb21-1068-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a68556615426c9b3872586e10052f02a-hb21-1068-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1068vote59c709

Bill Comments 750

feedback