CO HB1064 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enactment of the "Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact".
Title
Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 23-1064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Amendment L.005 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 23-1064 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 23-1064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Amendment L.005 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 23-1064 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Governor Signed | |
2023-03-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2023-02-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-02-01 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |