CO HB1064 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Access Safe Deposit Box Of Decedent
Title
Access Safe Deposit Box Of Decedent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1064 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1064 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1064 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1064 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1064 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-03-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-09 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-27 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |