CO HB1063 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibited Communications Concerning Patents

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited Communications Concerning Patents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05HouseGovernor Signed
2015-05-18HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-18HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-06HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-05-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2015-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
2015-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2015-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-14HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-01-29HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-01-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A35DBED9436A53D87257DA2006189AA?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A35DBED9436A53D87257DA2006189AA/$FILE/1063_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A35DBED9436A53D87257DA2006189AA/$FILE/1063app_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A35DBED9436A53D87257DA2006189AA/$FILE/1063_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A35DBED9436A53D87257DA2006189AA/$FILE/1063_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A35DBED9436A53D87257DA2006189AA/$FILE/1063_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A35DBED9436A53D87257DA2006189AA/$FILE/1063_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1A35DBED9436A53D87257DA2006189AA/$FILE/1063_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C5ABCE09F341C48787257DDD000BAEFE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C5ABCE09F341C48787257DDD000BAEFE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C0A325FB7A52527287257E23004C3AC4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4630BD5FF8BE393B87257E23004C43A6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D21C2DD521DA53EE87257E2F0082002A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D21C2DD521DA53EE87257E2F0082002A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C740DA8DB6BFE10487257E35007C6D2D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9556CF8D3DE8E92787257E38004E3666

Bill Comments

feedback