CO HB1062 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation Public Insurance Adjusters
Title
Regulation Public Insurance Adjusters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed on a vote of 6-4. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed on a vote of 6-4. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed on a vote of 6-4. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed on a vote of 6-4. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-13 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2013-03-07 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-07 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-05 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |