CO HB1061 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Skills For Jobs Act
Title
The Skills For Jobs Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1061 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1061 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1061, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1061, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1061 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1061 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1061, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1061, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2012-02-10 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-09 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-01-31 | House Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments | |
2012-01-30 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-01-25 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |