CO HB1060 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the scheduled repeal of reports by the department of health care policy and financing to the general assembly.
Title
Reporting Requirements By Health Care Policy & Financing To General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-02-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2017-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 01/30/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-01-24 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |