CO HB1058 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Senate Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Senate Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning services performed by a board certified behavior analyst for students during school hours.
Title
Behavior Analysts In Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Postpone House Bill 20-1058 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1058, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1058, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |