CO HB1054 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 6/1/2016 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

End-of-life Options For Terminally Ill Individuals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

End-of-life Options For Terminally Ill Individuals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment TT) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment OO) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment WW) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment VV) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment UU) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment PP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment SS) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment NN) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment RR) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment QQ) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment TT) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment OO) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment WW) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment VV) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment UU) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment PP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment SS) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment NN) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment RR) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment QQ) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1054, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1054, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-24HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 6/1/2016 - No Amendments
2016-02-18HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/24/2016 - No Amendments
2016-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-01-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/177327DC50AD352687257F240063F245?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/177327DC50AD352687257F240063F245/$FILE/1054_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/177327DC50AD352687257F240063F245/$FILE/1054jud_01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B4FC915C9E658B0187257F5000240B66
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B4FC915C9E658B0187257F5000240B66
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C1E9CEB56F5222BD87257F500021CEE2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C83B8C682BED98C387257F500021F717
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CE3F1F70CF30527487257F50001E9AC8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EEF8C2504752B30187257F5000221E67
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/76E97BCFF8282D9587257F50001F37F1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/266649E7575B5A8C87257F500022BC30
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/28F2DDA09B162E3C87257F5000230D79
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/55311A17D1A6B19287257F50002361BF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/623412661471519787257F50001ECD8D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0A1BC6496D55BD6187257F50002260C5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C1E9CEB56F5222BD87257F500021CEE2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C83B8C682BED98C387257F500021F717
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CE3F1F70CF30527487257F50001E9AC8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EEF8C2504752B30187257F5000221E67
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/76E97BCFF8282D9587257F50001F37F1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/266649E7575B5A8C87257F500022BC30
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/28F2DDA09B162E3C87257F5000230D79
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/55311A17D1A6B19287257F50002361BF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/623412661471519787257F50001ECD8D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0A1BC6496D55BD6187257F50002260C5

Bill Comments

feedback