CO HB1051 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-8)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-8)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modification of the Colorado affordable housing tax credit, and, in connection therewith, extending the time during which the credit may be claimed and increasing the yearly amount of credits that can be allocated.
Title
Mod Affordable Housing Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1051 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1051 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1051 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1051 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |