CO HB1051 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning human trafficking prevention training by the department of public safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Department of Public Safety HumanTrafficking-related Training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-29SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-26SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-17HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1051
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1051_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1051_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1051_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1051_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1051_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1051_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9bd2043ee9342238872583850081f9ba-hb19-1051-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9bd2043ee9342238872583850081f9ba-hb19-1051-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6606674efe476fd8872583de004b1543-hb19-1051-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6606674efe476fd8872583de004b1543-hb19-1051-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1051vote5641ce
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/db70b7cbfd05b29f872583e4007c7779-hb19-1051-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1051vote566ae0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1051vote1420b9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1051vote140ced
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/db70b7cbfd05b29f872583e4007c7779-hb19-1051-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback