CO HB1050 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the promotion of water-efficient landscaping on property subject to management by local supervisory entities.
Title
Encourage Use Of Xeriscape In Common Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1050 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1050 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Governor Signed | |
2019-02-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2019-01-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-01-17 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |