CO HB1049 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the elimination of refund interest related to a property tax abatement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate Property Tax Abatement Refund Interest

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20 Sent to the Governor
2017-04-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-03-31SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-03-30SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2017-03-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-03-23SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2017-02-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-02-13HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-02-08HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-01-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1049
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1049_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1049_en2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1049_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1049_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1049_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1049_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-02-08t094912z-hb17-1049-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-02-08t094912z-hb17-1049-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#240
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-03-23t110430z-hb17-1049-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-03-23t110430z-hb17-1049-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#606
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#704

Bill Comments

feedback