CO HB1048 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning delineator posts on a two-lane state highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Two-lane State Highway Staggered Delineator Posts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1048 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1048 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05 Governor Signed
2023-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-05-07SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-05-07SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-05-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2023-05-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-05-04HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-05-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-14HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2023-02-01HouseHouse Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb23-1048
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1048_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1048_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1048_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1048_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1048_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1048_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/6B3AA79EDF5A3D3C872589640069D88E/HB1048_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/6A7AED6C7FE055778725895E00591499/HB1048_L.005.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1048_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1048_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1048_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1048_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6062f6358bb2ba528725896400711bfd-hb23-1048-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6062f6358bb2ba528725896400711bfd-hb23-1048-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6062f6358bb2ba528725896400711bfd-hb23-1048-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/70bafc1a9139793687258991004e3d6f-hb23-1048-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1048vote7e9583
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8d95e9dfa65e4ef4872589a8006a48a5-hb23-1048-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1048vote155cd2

Bill Comments

feedback