CO HB1047 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning technical modifications to the "Fair Campaign Practices Act" to facilitate its administration.
Title
Fair Campaign Practices Act Technical Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment J]. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment I]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment J]. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment I]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-31 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |