CO HB1047 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the scheduled repeal of reports by the department of local affairs to the general assembly.
Title
Reporting Requirements By Department of Local Affairs To General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1047 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1047 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-01-25 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |