CO HB1046 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2019 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2019 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the waiver of fees that a delegate to a party assembly may be required to pay to participate in the party assembly.
Title
Freedom To Vote Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.005) (Y: 20 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 19 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 19 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-02-08 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-02-07 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/11/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-02-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-02-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/04/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-01-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-01-15 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |